U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00497
  • Case Name: Monzella v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • March 08, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 19, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2017: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 16, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 14, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • February 14, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 15, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 15, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 14, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 14, 2016: [Petition for Review]
  • November 14, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.