U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00494
  • Case Name: Scroggins v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Stay]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 15, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.