U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00495
  • Case Name: Longee v. IDOC-ISCC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Receipt]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 15, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 15, 2016: [Complaint]
  • November 15, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.