U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00498
  • Case Name: Reed v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 28, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Reopening Case]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: [Reopen Case]
  • July 01, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 01, 2019: [Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Stay]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 18, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Receipt]
  • November 17, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 17, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.