U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00499
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • March 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 22, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • March 21, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • March 20, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 18, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 17, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 17, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 17, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 17, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.