U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00501
  • Case Name: Ayala v. Armstrong et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 05, 2019: [Transcript]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 13, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Supplement]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 02, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • March 07, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 07, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • March 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 22, 2018: [Statement]
  • February 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 19, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 12, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 20, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 22, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 22, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 17, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 17, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 17, 2016: [Permanent Injunction]
  • November 17, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.