U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00502
  • Case Name: Jackson et al v. Caldwell School District No. 132
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 15, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 22, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 09, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Litigation Order]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 09, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.