U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00503
  • Case Name: Jessup et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 03, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 03, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 23, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 14, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 13, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 17, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 17, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 17, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 17, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.