U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00504
  • Case Name: Decoria et al v. Thunderbird, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 15, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • June 15, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 24, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 24, 2017: [Consent Filed]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 25, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 25, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.