U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00500
  • Case Name: Shuttlesworth et al v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 21, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 01, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 17, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 15, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 07, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2016: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.