U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00507
  • Case Name: Noorigian v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 15, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 24, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 22, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • February 22, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 21, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 21, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 21, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 21, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.