U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00508
  • Case Name: Glenn et al v. B&R Plastics, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 17, 2018: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • July 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 27, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Declaration]
  • June 22, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 22, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • June 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Errata]
  • June 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 30, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 25, 2018: [In Limine]
  • May 21, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order]
  • April 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • July 06, 2017: [Affidavit]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.