U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00511
  • Case Name: McGrath v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Supplement]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Stay]
  • February 28, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 28, 2017: [Response (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.