U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00367
  • Case Name: Mintun et al v. The State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 23, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 24, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 22, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 05, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 31, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 21, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Service]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 28, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 28, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 27, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 27, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Response (generic)]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.