U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00512
  • Case Name: Coffelt v. Director of Idaho Board of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 15, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 08, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 07, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Consolidate Cases]
  • November 30, 2016: [Complaint]
  • November 30, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.