U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00514
  • Case Name: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC v. Idaho Power Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 01, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • December 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 30, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.