U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00515
  • Case Name: Hammond v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 04, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • January 16, 2019: [Substitute Party]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice of Death]
  • July 24, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • July 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • January 30, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 30, 2018: [Substitute Party]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Death]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 29, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 01, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 05, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 05, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • March 29, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 05, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 01, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.