U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00513
  • Case Name: Ronald Clement et al v. Albertsons, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 12, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 05, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 05, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 06, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 01, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • February 01, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 26, 2016: [Reassign Case]
  • December 15, 2016: [Errata]
  • December 15, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 14, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.