U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Engineered Structures, Inc. v. Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Issuance]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 23, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 29, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 29, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2018: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2018: [Declaration]
  • February 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2018: [Statement]
  • February 21, 2018: [Declaration]
  • February 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Statement]
  • February 12, 2018: [Declaration]
  • February 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 12, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 08, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 30, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.