U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00518
  • Case Name: Ankeny v. THE HOME DEPOT USA, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 05, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Response to Discovery Request]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 28, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 22, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 27, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 27, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 07, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 05, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 02, 2016: [Declaration]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.