U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00519
  • Case Name: BOWEN v. Owners Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 17, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • February 09, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 23, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 23, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 05, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.