U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00520
  • Case Name: Davis et al v. Reynard
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Disqualify Judge]
  • January 11, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 24, 2017: [Receipt]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
  • December 05, 2016: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.