U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00521
  • Case Name: Power Constructors, Inc. v. Old Republic General Insurance Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 07, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.