U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00523
  • Case Name: Charboneau v. Ada County Prosecutor's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Appendix]
  • February 17, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • February 17, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.