U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00524
  • Case Name: Collis v. Tomlinson and Associates and its owners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • October 03, 2017: [Appendix]
  • October 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
  • September 11, 2017: [Clarify]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 06, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • December 06, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2016: [Complaint]
  • December 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.