U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00530
  • Case Name: Stevens v. Brigham Young University - Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 21, 2021: [Seal Document]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 09, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 09, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • November 13, 2020: [Disqualify Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: [Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 04, 2020: [Compel]
  • February 04, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 03, 2020: [Return Mail]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 04, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2019: [Errata]
  • November 18, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2019: [Strike]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Exclude]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 24, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 23, 2019: [Seal]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Declaration]
  • August 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • August 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Seal]
  • July 17, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Declaration]
  • July 03, 2019: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • July 03, 2019: [Seal]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 14, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2019: [Seal]
  • May 31, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 31, 2019: [Declaration]
  • May 29, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 28, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 28, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 16, 2019: [Compel]
  • April 11, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 11, 2019: [Transcript]
  • April 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 21, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Declaration]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • March 06, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 04, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 22, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 19, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 15, 2019: [Renew]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 08, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • January 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2018: [Seal]
  • December 18, 2018: [Sanctions]
  • December 18, 2018: [Compel]
  • December 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • December 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 11, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 11, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 11, 2018: [Seal]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 03, 2018: [Affidavit]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Joinder]
  • November 30, 2018: [Declaration]
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 30, 2018: [Seal]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 22, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 10, 2018: [Errata]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 21, 2018: [Errata]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 06, 2018: [Compel]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • July 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 18, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 18, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Compel]
  • June 12, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • June 06, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2018: [Errata]
  • May 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Strike]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 30, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • March 30, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • March 30, 2018: [Seal]
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 29, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 16, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Declaration]
  • March 07, 2018: [Errata]
  • March 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 23, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 23, 2018: [Intervene]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 22, 2018: [Compel]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 14, 2018: [Seal]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • January 29, 2018: [Joinder]
  • January 25, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
  • June 05, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 02, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • April 27, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 27, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 04, 2017: [Consent Filed]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 28, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 24, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Status Report]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.