U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00528
  • Case Name: Omnipure Filter Company, Inc. v. Watts Water Technologies, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 14, 2017: [Status Report]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2017: [Status Report]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Stay]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 30, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [Transfer Case]
  • March 09, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 01, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 13, 2017: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • February 06, 2017: [Response (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 25, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
  • January 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 11, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.