U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00527
  • Case Name: Scott v. City of Payette
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • April 11, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 01, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 30, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 17, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.