U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00531
  • Case Name: Grande et al v. Bonner County Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order]
  • January 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 18, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 18, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 23, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 16, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 16, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Consent Filed]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 13, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 12, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.