U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00526
  • Case Name: Cryer v. Idaho Department of Labor
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 11, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Strike]
  • April 24, 2018: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 30, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 30, 2018: [Declaration]
  • March 30, 2018: [Statement]
  • March 30, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 30, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 26, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • February 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • February 06, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 15, 2017: [Status Report]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • December 14, 2017: [Status Report]
  • December 14, 2017: [Compel]
  • December 01, 2017: [Protective Order]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.