U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00556
  • Case Name: Whitlow v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • March 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 24, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 03, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • February 02, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2017: [Stay]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.