U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00417
  • Case Name: United Commercial Insurance, LLC v. Top Local Leads, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 04, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • January 26, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 31, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 10, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order]
  • June 22, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 01, 2017: [Consent Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Status Report]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Status Report]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.