U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00557
  • Case Name: Hernandez-Gomez v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2019: [Response (generic)]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Stay]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 09, 2018: [Request]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response (generic)]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.