U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00558
  • Case Name: Stefanski et al v. Jackson Jet Center, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 02, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.