U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00559
  • Case Name: Bryant v. Matrix Trust Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 20, 2018: [Response to Objection to R&R]
  • March 06, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 11, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 24, 2017: [Errata]
  • March 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 07, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.