U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00560
  • Case Name: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Cossey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Statement]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 12, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 28, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 13, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 10, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 15, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 09, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order]
  • February 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 31, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.