U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Cusack v. Bendpak, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 04, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Objection]
  • September 17, 2018: [Quash]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2018: [Objection]
  • September 14, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • September 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 07, 2018: [Strike]
  • September 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 06, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 06, 2018: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • September 06, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 06, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • September 05, 2018: [Reconsideration]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Witness List]
  • August 28, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 27, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 27, 2018: [Witness List]
  • August 27, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2018: [Strike]
  • June 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2018: [Exclude]
  • May 10, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 10, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 07, 2018: [Transcript]
  • May 04, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 03, 2018: [Transcript Request]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 19, 2018: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • March 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 16, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Strike]
  • March 01, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 08, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 14, 2017: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 08, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2017: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [In Limine]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Stipulation]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 07, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 07, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Consent Filed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • January 10, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 05, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 05, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 05, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 05, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 05, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.