U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Weimer v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 05, 2017: [Request]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 05, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 05, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.