U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Andoe v. Kempf et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 05, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 21, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 31, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 31, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2017: [Disqualify Judge]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 05, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 05, 2017: [Complaint]
  • January 05, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 05, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.