U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Hodock v. City of Nampa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 25, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • May 26, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 25, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • April 24, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 17, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 23, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.