U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Moore v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 20, 2017: [Remand to Agency]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2017
  • October 07, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • August 09, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 09, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 06, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.