U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Pfeiffer v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • September 19, 2017: [Remand]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 29, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 28, 2017: [Declaration]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 30, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Consent Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 30, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • May 30, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 11, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 06, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.