U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Shirley v. Rich
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Return Mail]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • July 24, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Request]
  • May 16, 2017: [Discovery]
  • May 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Request]
  • April 04, 2017: [Request]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Request]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Request]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Complaint]
  • January 10, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 10, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.