U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Dalrymple v. Yordy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Request]
  • June 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 20, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 04, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Complaint]
  • January 11, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • January 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.