U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00016
  • Case Name: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Jensen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Judgment - Default]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • October 05, 2017: [Affidavit]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Default Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 06, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Default Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 13, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 13, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 13, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.