U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Unigard Insurance Company v. Afni, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 09, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Litigation Order]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 09, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 13, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.