U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Morrison v. Presiding Judge et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Receipt]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 13, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.