U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Lindstrom v. Bingham County, Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 17, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 01, 2018: [In Limine]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: [Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [Statement]
  • January 19, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 11, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 27, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 02, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 13, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.