U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Davis v. Kelso et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 21, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Consent Filed]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 26, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • January 26, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.