U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Peters v. Ada County Sheriff
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • January 20, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.